TX HB766 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers and fire fighters from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers and fire fighters from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1965 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#379 (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#350 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1965 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#379 (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#350 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1965 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Watson |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Watson |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#379 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#350 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
City Government--Employees/Officers
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General