TX HB759 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of threat assessment teams in public schools and the establishment of a student threat assessment database; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the operation of threat assessment teams in public schools and the establishment of a student threat assessment database; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety