TX HB745 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the limitation on increases in the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the limitation on increases in the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2023-02-28HouseRead first time
2022-11-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB152 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Local Government
SB152 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Local Government
HJR51 (Enabling for) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1223 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1733 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB881 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HB3972 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback