TX HB741 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to rights and benefits under the Texas workers' compensation system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to rights and benefits under the Texas workers' compensation system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#885 (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#885
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Bailes and Kacal
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB229 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback