TX HB741 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of a public employee to express breast milk in the workplace.
Title
Relating to the right of a public employee to express breast milk in the workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - HB 741Third Reading House (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Education
Education--School Districts
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Women
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Education
Education--School Districts
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Women