TX HB741 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criteria for financing certain multifamily housing developments.
Title
Relating to criteria for financing certain multifamily housing developments.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Postponed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-02-22 | Read first time | |
2011-01-20 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Education--School Districts
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General