TX HB740 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to preferential voting in runoff elections for certain voters voting by mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to preferential voting in runoff elections for certain voters voting by mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1120 (Y: 83 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1120
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback