TX HB740 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance and renewal of licenses and registrations for certain child-care facilities and the amount of the fees for those licenses.
Title
Relating to the issuance and renewal of licenses and registrations for certain child-care facilities and the amount of the fees for those licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#548 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-27 | House | Filed |