TX HB735 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to service contracts for leased or purchased motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to service contracts for leased or purchased motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-03HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-31HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1080 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB735
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00735I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00735S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00735F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00735I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00735H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00735E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00735E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB735&RcdVtNo=132&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback