TX HB72 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain responsibilities of education research centers and to a joint advisory board for education research centers.
Title
Relating to certain responsibilities of education research centers and to a joint advisory board for education research centers.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-06-14 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-06-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-06-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-06-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-06-09 | Read first time | |
2011-06-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
JOINT ADVISORY BOARD FOR EDUCATION RESEARCH CENTERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
JOINT ADVISORY BOARD FOR EDUCATION RESEARCH CENTERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=821&Bill=HB72 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/821/billtext/html/HB00072I.htm |