TX HB715 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to foreclose a lien on property to recover certain expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to foreclose a lien on property to recover certain expenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback