TX HB7 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal regulation of the removal of trees on private property.
Title
Relating to municipal regulation of the removal of trees on private property.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - FA8 Kolkhorst (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#171 (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - Rules suspended RV#170 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#18 (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#10 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - FA8 Kolkhorst (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#171 (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - Rules suspended RV#170 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#18 (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#10 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-08-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-08-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-08-15 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-08-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-15 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-08-15 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-08-15 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-15 | House | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules |
2017-08-15 | House | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-08-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-08-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Amended |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Point of order overruled |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-08-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-14 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2017-08-12 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2017-08-12 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2017-08-11 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-08-11 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-08-11 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-08-04 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-07-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-28 | House | Passed |
2017-07-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-07-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-21 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-07-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-20 | House | Filed |