TX HB699 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school attendance requirements for students diagnosed with or undergoing related treatment for severe or life-threatening illnesses.
Title
Relating to public school attendance requirements for students diagnosed with or undergoing related treatment for severe or life-threatening illnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1266 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#97 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#97 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1266 |
2021-05-20 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-07 | House | Record vote RV#97 |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-06 | House | Amended 1-Rosenthal |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
RILEY'S RULE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
RILEY'S RULE