TX HB695 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#690 (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#690 (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#690 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB356 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Roads
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--Roads
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road