TX HB686 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the release on parole of certain youthful offenders; changing parole eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the release on parole of certain youthful offenders; changing parole eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1738 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#109 (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Amended RV#100 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-30SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2021-05-30HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1738
2021-05-30HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-30HouseHouse discharges conferees
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees w/inst-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees with instructions
2021-05-28HouseMotion prevails
2021-05-28HouseMotion to instruct conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Whitmire
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio
2021-05-24SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-05-24SenateLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-24SenatePostponed 5/24/21 11:00 PM
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Whitmire
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-08HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08HouseRecord vote RV#109
2021-04-08HousePassed
2021-04-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-07HouseRecord vote RV#100
2021-04-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-07HouseAmended 2-Toth
2021-04-07HouseAmended 1-Toth
2021-04-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB687 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB686
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00686I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00686H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00686E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00686S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00686F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00686H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00686H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00686S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00686S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00686I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00686H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00686H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00686E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00686E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00686S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00686S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00686F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB686&RcdVtNo=100&Ch=H&Dt=04/07/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB686&RcdVtNo=109&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=91
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB686&RcdVtNo=1738&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021

Bill Comments

feedback