TX HB678 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#126 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-04SenateRead first time
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-02HouseRecord vote RV#126
2019-04-02HousePassed
2019-04-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback