TX HB676 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the entitlement of spouses of certain veterans with disabilities to a veteran's employment preference.
Title
Relating to the entitlement of spouses of certain veterans with disabilities to a veteran's employment preference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#514 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB109 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees