TX HB675 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the participation of armed forces members in a marriage ceremony through video conference technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the participation of armed forces members in a marriage ceremony through video conference technology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback