TX HB662 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the recovery of overallocated state funds by the Texas Education Agency.
Title
Relating to the recovery of overallocated state funds by the Texas Education Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB662 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00662I.htm |