TX HB661 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1233 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2016-12-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback