TX HB655 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09

Summary

Relating to payment to a trustee or substitute trustee after public sale of foreclosed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payment to a trustee or substitute trustee after public sale of foreclosed property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-19 Effective on 9/1/09
2009-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2009-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-25 Signed in the Senate
2009-05-24 Signed in the House
2009-05-24 Reported enrolled
2009-05-21 Senate passage reported
2009-05-21 Record vote
2009-05-21 Passed
2009-05-21 Read 3rd time
2009-05-21 Record vote
2009-05-21 Three day rule suspended
2009-05-21 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-21 Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2009-05-21 Laid before the Senate
2009-05-21 Not again placed on intent calendar
2009-05-21 Placed on local & uncontested calendar
2009-05-18 Placed on intent calendar
2009-05-14 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-14 Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
2009-05-14 Reported favorably w/o amendments
2009-05-13 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-13 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-01 Referred to Jurisprudence
2009-05-01 Read first time
2009-04-27 Received from the House
2009-04-27 Reported engrossed
2009-04-24 Record vote
2009-04-24 Passed
2009-04-24 Read 3rd time
2009-04-24 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-24 Record vote
2009-04-24 Constitutional three day rule suspended
2009-04-24 Passed to engrossment as amended
2009-04-24 Amended
2009-04-24 Read 2nd time
2009-04-24 Placed on General State Calendar
2009-04-22 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-17 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-16 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-16 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-07 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-07 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-07 Recalled from subcommittee
2009-04-07 Considered in formal meeting
2009-03-09 Subcommittee members named
2009-03-09 Referred to subcommittee
2009-03-09 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-02 Left pending in committee
2009-03-02 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-02 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-02 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-18 Referred to Business & Industry
2009-02-18 Read first time
2009-01-15 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback