TX HB654 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for returning adult students at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate that may be charged to those students for certain excessive undergraduate hours.
Title
Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for returning adult students at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate that may be charged to those students for certain excessive undergraduate hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS