TX HB652 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice of an animal's possible exposure in an animal shelter to certain communicable or infectious diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice of an animal's possible exposure in an animal shelter to certain communicable or infectious diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - Amended RV#635 (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Failed to pass RV#615 (Y: 44 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 2nd time RV#572 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#635
2021-05-03HousePassed as amended
2021-05-03HouseAmended 1-Buckley
2021-05-03HouseVote reconsidered
2021-04-30House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#615
2021-04-30HouseFailed to pass
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#572
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB652
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00652I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00652H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00652E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00652H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00652I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00652H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00652H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB652&RcdVtNo=572&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB652&RcdVtNo=615&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB652&RcdVtNo=635&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback