TX HB651 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in counties not served by a hospital district or a public hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in counties not served by a hospital district or a public hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#242 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 2nd time RV#226 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#242
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#226
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-02-26HouseCorrection in referral
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback