TX HB642 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties to be used for transportation projects.
Title
Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties to be used for transportation projects.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#931 (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#865 (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#865 (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#931 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#865 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration