TX HB639 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the purchase of certain insurance coverage by public schools for the benefit of businesses and students participating in career and technology programs and providing for immunity from liability of certain public school students participating in career and technology programs.
Title
Relating to authorizing the purchase of certain insurance coverage by public schools for the benefit of businesses and students participating in career and technology programs and providing for immunity from liability of certain public school students participating in career and technology programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#884 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#884 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Insurance--Public Employees
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Insurance--Public Employees
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions