TX HB633 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-28 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-28 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of money associated with delays of transportation projects.
Title
Relating to the allocation of money associated with delays of transportation projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB282 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous