TX HB622 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating abbreviated educator preparation programs for certification in marketing education and certification in health science technology education.
Title
Relating to creating abbreviated educator preparation programs for certification in marketing education and certification in health science technology education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#742 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#742 |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Meza |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Science & Technology
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Science & Technology