TX HB618 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the participation of open-enrollment charter schools in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
Title
Relating to the participation of open-enrollment charter schools in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 346 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB346 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS