TX HB616 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reimbursement for a certain portion of a forensic medical examination of a sexual assault survivor and for the evidence collection kit required for the examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reimbursement for a certain portion of a forensic medical examination of a sexual assault survivor and for the evidence collection kit required for the examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1843 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#447 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1843
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#447
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback