TX HB604 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a microchip scan of animals in the custody of an animal shelter or releasing agency, including an animal rescue organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a microchip scan of animals in the custody of an animal shelter or releasing agency, including an animal rescue organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#203 (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenatePassed
2021-05-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-04SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#203
2021-04-14HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB604
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00604I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00604H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00604S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00604F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00604I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00604H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00604E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00604E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB604&RcdVtNo=203&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments 750

feedback