TX HB603 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain complaints concerning the Texas Medical Board.
Title
Relating to certain complaints concerning the Texas Medical Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |