TX HB6 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 72-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.

Sponsors

Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2021-05-06HouseCompanion considered in lieu of CSSB 7
2021-05-06HousePostponed 5/6/21 5:00 PM
2021-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB7 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Point of order overruled Rule 13, Section 9(a)(2)
SB7 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Point of order overruled Rule 13, Section 9(a)(2)

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback