TX HB577 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a political subdivision to adopt or enforce certain regulations regarding whether a private employer may obtain or consider an employment applicant's or employee's criminal history record information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a political subdivision to adopt or enforce certain regulations regarding whether a private employer may obtain or consider an employment applicant's or employee's criminal history record information.

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback