TX HB570 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to small business recovery funds and insurance tax credits for certain investments in those funds; imposing a monetary penalty; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to small business recovery funds and insurance tax credits for certain investments in those funds; imposing a monetary penalty; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#525 (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#525 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-28 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1710 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--General