TX HB567 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#77 (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#68 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-28SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-08SenateRead first time
2021-04-06SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-01HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-01HouseRecord vote RV#77
2021-04-01HousePassed
2021-04-01HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-04-01HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Slaton
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRecord vote RV#68
2021-03-31HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-31HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-03-31HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 35(a)
2021-03-31HouseAmendment(s) offered 5-Slaton
2021-03-31HouseAmended 4-Wu
2021-03-31HouseAmended 3-Cook
2021-03-31HouseAmended 2-Cook
2021-03-31HouseAmended 1-Wu
2021-03-31HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-31HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB190 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB567
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00567I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00567H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00567E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00567S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00567F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00567H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00567I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00567H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00567H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00567E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00567E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB567&RcdVtNo=68&Ch=H&Dt=03/31/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB567&RcdVtNo=77&Ch=H&Dt=04/01/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=42

Bill Comments

feedback