TX HB565 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required training regarding trauma-informed care for certain judges and attorneys.
Title
Relating to required training regarding trauma-informed care for certain judges and attorneys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Courts
Courts--Judges
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--Judges
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUPREME COURT