TX HB558 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the taking of a blood specimen on arrest for certain intoxication offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the taking of a blood specimen on arrest for certain intoxication offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1185 (Y: 92 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-05-27SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-27SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-27SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateAmended
2021-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hall
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1185
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB558
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00558I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00558H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00558E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00558S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00558F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00558S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00558I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00558H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00558H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00558E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00558E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00558F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB558&RcdVtNo=1185&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=114
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=115
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=223

Bill Comments 750

feedback