TX HB555 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duration of a special open hunting season for game animals and certain game birds taken by persons under 17 years of age.
Title
Relating to the duration of a special open hunting season for game animals and certain game birds taken by persons under 17 years of age.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#365 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#365 |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-19 | House | Amended 1-Vasut |
2023-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |