TX HB554 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of a motor vehicle passing a pedestrian or a person operating a bicycle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of a motor vehicle passing a pedestrian or a person operating a bicycle.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1290 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback