TX HB553 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a task force to identify opportunities for academic credit and industry recognition for inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a task force to identify opportunities for academic credit and industry recognition for inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1908 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#947 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-19SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Corrections
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback