TX HB549 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to an affirmative defense to prosecution for certain sex offenses.
Title
Relating to an affirmative defense to prosecution for certain sex offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-30 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-18 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Passed | |
2009-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT