TX HB545 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 1/10/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of unlawful transfer of a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of unlawful transfer of a firearm.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePostponed 1/10/21 10:00 AM
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback