TX HB544 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of the rural water assistance fund.
Title
Relating to the use of the rural water assistance fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Scott Cosper [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#144 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#144 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-08 | House | Filed |