TX HB542 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to foster care placement in and the licensing of certain residential child-care facilities.
Title
Relating to foster care placement in and the licensing of certain residential child-care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#606 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#606 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION