TX HB5413 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Waller County Municipal Utility District No. 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Waller County Municipal Utility District No. 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12 Effective immediately
2023-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2023-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-26HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2023-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-24SenateRecord vote
2023-05-24SenatePassed
2023-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-24SenateRecord vote
2023-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-05-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-18SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2023-05-15SenateReferred to Local Government
2023-05-15SenateRead first time
2023-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1580
2023-05-12HousePassed
2023-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-05-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-05-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-04-26HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2023-04-26HouseRead first time
2023-04-25HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2023-04-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB5413
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05413I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05413H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05413E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05413S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05413F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB05413I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB05413H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB05413H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB05413E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB05413E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB5413&RcdVtNo=1580&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=46

Bill Comments

feedback