TX HB54 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to accompanying and filming peace officers of state and local law enforcement agencies for producing reality television programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to accompanying and filming peace officers of state and local law enforcement agencies for producing reality television programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#255 (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective immediately
2021-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenatePassed
2021-05-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-11SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#255
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14HouseAmended 1-Talarico
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB223 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB54
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00054I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00054H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00054E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00054S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00054F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00054H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00054I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00054H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00054H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00054E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00054E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB54&RcdVtNo=255&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=13

Bill Comments 750

feedback