TX HB539 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of distinguishing license plates for farm and ranch vehicles.
Title
Relating to the issuance of distinguishing license plates for farm and ranch vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration