TX HB5364 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eminent domain authority of the Crosby Municipal Utility District.
Title
Relating to the eminent domain authority of the Crosby Municipal Utility District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2023-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-11 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-04-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2583 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
SB2583 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
SB2583 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CROSBY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility