TX HB525 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of religious organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of religious organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1718 (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1033 (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-29HouseRecord vote RV#1718
2021-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-29HouseHouse discharges conferees
2021-05-28HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1033
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-12HouseAmended 1-Shaheen
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB525
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00525I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00525H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00525E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00525S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00525F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00525H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00525S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00525I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00525H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00525E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00525E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00525F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB525&RcdVtNo=1033&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=82
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB525&RcdVtNo=1718&Ch=H&Dt=05/29/2021

Bill Comments

feedback